Player History |
06/15/1962 | Drafted in the 1962 first-year player draft (Round 5, Pick 18, 92nd overall pick) by the The Bronx Ironmen, out of high school (Holy Trinity Episcopal; Melbourne, FL). |
07/28/1962 | Signed a minor league contract with the The Bronx Ironmen organization with a signing bonus of $4,600. |
01/01/1963 | OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 10 (12); Power: 1 (3); Eye: 4 (9). |
08/08/1963 | Injured (broken hand), out for 3-4 months. |
01/01/1964 | OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 9 (11); Power: 1 (3); Eye: 7 (11). |
04/28/1964 | Injured (hamstring soreness), out for 4 days. |
01/01/1965 | OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 9 (10); Power: 2 (3); Eye: 7 (9). |
01/01/1966 | OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 9 (10); Power: 2 (3); Eye: 9 (10). |
01/01/1967 | OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 9 (10); Power: 2 (3); Eye: 9 (10). |
06/17/1967 | Injured (knee contusion), out for one week. |
07/02/1967 | Was traded by the The Bronx Ironmen to the Manhattan Peril, along with SP Carlos Rodríguez, in exchange for SP Bill Brown. |
01/01/1968 | OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 10 (10); Power: 2 (3); Eye: 9 (9). |
07/08/1968 | Injured (strained oblique), out for 1-2 weeks. |
09/30/1968 | Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/1969 | OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 9 (10); Power: 2 (3); Eye: 8 (8). |
04/10/1969 | Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Boston Morrills organization. |
10/01/1969 | Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/1970 | OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 9 (9); Power: 3 (3); Eye: 8 (8). |
04/09/1970 | Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Boston Colonials organization. |
10/05/1970 | Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/1971 | OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 10 (10); Power: 3 (3); Eye: 8 (8). |
04/08/1971 | Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Chicago Clout organization. |
10/04/1971 | Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/1972 | OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 11 (11); Power: 4 (4); Eye: 8 (8). |
04/09/1972 | Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Boston Morrills organization. |
07/08/1972 | Released by the Boston organization. |
07/08/1972 | Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the St. Louis Dredgers organization. |
07/19/1972 | Injured (strained hamstring), out for 3 weeks. |
10/02/1972 | Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/1973 | OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 9 (9); Power: 4 (4); Eye: 9 (9). |
04/09/1973 | Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Cincinnati Rivermen organization. |
05/10/1973 | Released by the Cincinnati organization. |
05/10/1973 | Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Cincinnati Rivermen organization. |
06/16/1973 | Released by the Cincinnati organization. |
06/16/1973 | Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Boston Colonials organization. |
06/27/1973 | Released by the Boston organization. |
06/27/1973 | Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Baltimore Barons organization. |
09/25/1973 | Released by the Baltimore organization. |
01/01/1974 | OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 9 (9); Power: 3 (3); Eye: 8 (8). |
04/06/1974 | Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the San Antonio Revenge organization. |
09/30/1974 | Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/1975 | OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 9 (9); Power: 3 (3); Eye: 7 (7). |
01/01/1976 | OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 9 (9); Power: 4 (4); Eye: 9 (9). |
01/01/1976 | Retired from professional baseball. |