| | 04/26/1981 | | | | | | | | | | | | RF Brad Williams #37 | | | | Age: 30 | Bats: L | Throws: L | Morale: Normal | |
|
|
| |
|
|
G | AB | H | 2B | 3B | HR | RBI | BB | K | AVG | OBP | SLG | SB | | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | .000 | .000 | .000 | 0 | | | | Overall | Potential | Contact | | | Gap | | | Power | | | Eye | | | Avoid K's | | |
| Batting Ratings (OSA) | | | Overall | Vs Left | Vs Right | Potential | Contact | 5 | 5 | 5 | 5 | | Gap | 6 | 6 | 7 | 6 | | Power | 4 | 4 | 4 | 4 | | Eye | 4 | 4 | 4 | 4 | | Avoid K's | 3 | 3 | 3 | 3 | |
| | Fielding Ratings | | Catcher | Infield | Outfield | Range: | - | 1 | 17 | Errors: | - | 1 | 15 | Arm: | 1 | 1 | 12 | Turn DP: | - | 1 | - | Ability: | 1 | - | - |
| Position Ratings | Pitcher: | - | Shortstop: | - | Catcher: | - | Left Field: | 20 | 1st Base: | - | Center Field: | 12 | 2nd Base: | - | Right Field: | 20 | 3rd Base: | - | | | | | | |
| Run/Bunt Ratings | Running Speed: | 3 | Stealing Ability: | 1 | Baserunning Inst.: | 1 | Sacrifice Bunt: | 7 | Bunt for Hit: | 1 | | |
| | Game Log, Last 10 Games | Date | Vs. | Result | AB | R | H | BI | HR | BB | K | SB | | Personality Ratings | Leader Ability: | Very Low | Loyalty: | Very High | Desire f. Win: | High | Greed: | High | Intelligence: | Low | Work Ethic: | Low | |
|
|
| Brad Williams | Birthday: | 03/15/1924 | Born in: | Santa Clarita (California) | Nationality: | American | Height: | 6' 1" | Weight: | 205 lbs | Local Popularity: | Unknown | National Pop.: | Unknown |
Status | Contract: | RETIRED | Salary: | - | Signed Through: | - | Major Service: | None, None | Service This Yr: | None | 40-Man Service: | None, None | Pro Service: | 8 Years | Arbitration Eligibility: | Not eligible, free agent after contract expires! | Option Years: | 3 option years left | Contract Extension: | - | Drafted: | - | |
|
|
Career Batting Stats | Year/Team/League | Age | G | AB | H | 2B | 3B | HR | RBI | R | BB | HP | SF | K | SB | CS | AVG | OBP | SLG | OPS | OPS+ | VORP |
| Career Minor League Batting Stats | Year/Team/League | Age | G | AB | H | 2B | 3B | HR | RBI | R | BB | HP | SF | K | SB | CS | AVG | OBP | SLG | OPS | OPS+ | VORP | 1951 Laredo - AA | 27 | 89 | 163 | 39 | 8 | 0 | 2 | 27 | 19 | 16 | 1 | 1 | 28 | 0 | 0 | .239 | .309 | .325 | .635 | 110 | 6.8 | 1952 Laredo - AA | 28 | 75 | 98 | 26 | 5 | 2 | 3 | 20 | 13 | 9 | 2 | 2 | 14 | 0 | 0 | .265 | .333 | .449 | .782 | 108 | 5.1 | 1952 Guelph - AAA | 28 | 1 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 1 | 0 | 0 | .000 | .000 | .000 | .000 | -100 | -0.2 | 1953 Lake Elsinore - A | 29 | 16 | 45 | 20 | 5 | 0 | 2 | 7 | 7 | 9 | 0 | 0 | 3 | 0 | 0 | .444 | .537 | .689 | 1.226 | 225 | 11.5 | 1953 Kingsville - AA | 29 | 27 | 23 | 4 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 1 | 1 | 3 | 0 | 1 | 3 | 0 | 0 | .174 | .259 | .217 | .477 | 31 | -1.9 | 1954 El Monte - A | 30 | 58 | 100 | 25 | 3 | 0 | 4 | 15 | 11 | 26 | 0 | 2 | 10 | 0 | 0 | .250 | .398 | .400 | .798 | 114 | 5.9 | Total GHL | | 1 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 1 | 0 | 0 | .000 | .000 | .000 | .000 | -100 | -0.2 | Total STL | | 191 | 284 | 69 | 14 | 2 | 5 | 48 | 33 | 28 | 3 | 4 | 45 | 0 | 0 | .243 | .313 | .359 | .673 | 103 | 10.0 | Total SCL | | 74 | 145 | 45 | 8 | 0 | 6 | 22 | 18 | 35 | 0 | 2 | 13 | 0 | 0 | .310 | .440 | .490 | .929 | 147 | 17.5 |
| Career Fielding Stats | Year/Team/League | POS | G | GS | PO | A | DP | TC | E | PCT | INN | RNG | ZR | EFF | PB | RSTA | RTO | RTO% | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
| Player History | 04/05/1951 | Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the New York Empires organization. | 01/01/1952 | OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (5); Power: 4 (5); Eye: 3 (3). | 10/16/1952 | Became a minor league free agent. | 01/01/1953 | OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (5); Power: 4 (4); Eye: 6 (6). | 04/09/1953 | Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Boston Colonials organization. | 10/15/1953 | Became a minor league free agent. | 01/01/1954 | OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (5); Power: 4 (4); Eye: 4 (4). | 04/08/1954 | Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Los Angeles Quakes organization. | 08/31/1954 | Retired from professional baseball. | |
|
|